THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:28:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 404-27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 533-6488
Fax: 416-533-9204
Address: 27 Roncesvalles Ave.
Suite 404
Toronto ON M6R 3B2
Phone: 416-533-6488
Fax: 647-689-7285

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jul 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 404-27 Roncesvalles Avenue
Toronto Ontario M6R 3B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 533-6488
Fax: 416-533-9204
Address: 27 Roncesvalles Ave.
Suite 404
Toronto ON M6R 3B2
Phone: 416-533-6488
Fax: 647-689-7285

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Jul 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
09 Jun 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jun 09 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Patrick Thomas Dornack may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Patrick Thomas Dornack may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Jun 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 13 Nov 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 30 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 May 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 13 Nov 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jul 2013