THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:12:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: Stewart, Tara Lynn (Used Until: 08 Mar 2015)
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 377 Church Street
Suite 208
Markham ON L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-597-6775
Fax: 289-459-0221
Address: Grand Genesis Health
Level 2
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M1 502
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: 289-597-6775
Fax: 289-459-0221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 23 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St. Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: St. Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tara Lynn Teshima Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Teshima (CPSO#: 101927 )
Business Address: Health Services Building
Suite 408
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
(289) 597-6775
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(289) 597-6775
Business Address: 9080 Yonge Street
Level 2
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
(289) 597-7676
Business Address: 377 Church Street
Suite 208
Markham Ontario L6B1A1
289 597 6775

General Information

Former Name: Stewart, Tara Lynn (Used Until: 08 Mar 2015)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 377 Church Street
Suite 208
Markham ON L6B 1A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-597-6775
Fax: 289-459-0221
Address: Grand Genesis Health
Level 2
9080 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
Phone: 289-597-7676
Fax: 289-597-7675
Address: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
2075 Bayview Avenue
Room M1 502
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
Phone: 289-597-6775
Fax: 289-459-0221

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Plastic Surgery
Effective: 23 May 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Plastic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St. Michael's Hospital Toronto
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: St. Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Tara Lynn Teshima Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Mar 2015
Shareholders:
Dr. T. Teshima (CPSO#: 101927 )
Business Address: Health Services Building
Suite 408
379 Church Street
Markham Ontario L6B 0T1
(289) 597-6775
Business Address: 2075 Bayview Avenue
Toronto Ontario M4N 3M5
(289) 597-6775
Business Address: 9080 Yonge Street
Level 2
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 0Y7
(289) 597-7676
Business Address: 377 Church Street
Suite 208
Markham Ontario L6B1A1
289 597 6775

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA LYNN TESHIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESHIMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TARA LYNN TESHIMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TESHIMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Feb 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee
Effective Date: 16 Feb 2018
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.
 
See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a Caution-in-Person: 

Training

Medical School: University of Alberta Faculty of Medicine and Dentistry, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2013