THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:44:17 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Bayly St W
Level 1
Suite 100
Ajax ON L1S 7K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054262233
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 65 Bayly St W
Level 1
Suite 100
Ajax ON L1S 7K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054262233
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Orthopedic Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2015
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Orthopedic Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site Ajax
HOSPITAL: Lakeridge Health Ajax and Pickering Site
LOCATION: Ajax

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEAGHAN DEBORAH ROLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROLLINS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEAGHAN DEBORAH ROLLINS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROLLINS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Sep 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Sep 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Aug 2013