THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:40:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4800 Leslie Street
Suite 212
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 497-1987
Fax: (416) 497-0712
Address: 2937 Major Mackenzie Drive West
South Mackenzie Kids Clinic
Walk-in Clinic
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3N9
Phone: 905-553-0305
Fax: 905-553-0350

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Aug 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4800 Leslie Street
Suite 212
Toronto Ontario M2J 2K9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 497-1987
Fax: (416) 497-0712
Address: 2937 Major Mackenzie Drive West
South Mackenzie Kids Clinic
Walk-in Clinic
Vaughan Ontario L6A 3N9
Phone: 905-553-0305
Fax: 905-553-0350

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Aug 2013
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 13 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
11 Feb 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Feb 11 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Preeya Govan may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Preeya Govan may practise medicine independently in paediatrics.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: American University of the Caribbean, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Feb 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 11 Feb 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 23 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 13 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Aug 2013