THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:06:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fac Fed de Ciencias Med de Porto Alegre, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Leadership Sinai Centre
For Diabetes
60 Murray St
Suite L5-210 Mailbox 21
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7628
Fax: (416) 586-8363

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 01 Oct 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Fac Fed de Ciencias Med de Porto Alegre, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Leadership Sinai Centre
For Diabetes
60 Murray St
Suite L5-210 Mailbox 21
Toronto Ontario M5T 3L9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 586-4800
Extension: 7628
Fax: (416) 586-8363

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 01 Oct 2014
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 01 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Brazil

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
24 Nov 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 24 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CAROLINE KAERCHER KRAMER may practise medicine independently in endocrinology and metabolism.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. CAROLINE KAERCHER KRAMER may practise medicine independently in endocrinology and metabolism.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fac Fed de Ciencias Med de Porto Alegre, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 24 Nov 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Jul 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Sep 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Jul 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2013