THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:15:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Pakistan
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Syed Hashmatullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Newfoundland and Labrador
Pakistan
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Syed Hashmatullah Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 03 Dec 2021

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 06 Aug 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 01 Sep 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Nov 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 Aug 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 28 Jul 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 21 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Aug 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Aug 2013