THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
25/05/25 03:58:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2009 - 330 Ridout St N
London Ontario N6A 0H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 1-855-959-2474
Address: 340 High St
Brightshores Health System - Southampton Hospital Ontario N0H 2L0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Geraldton District Hospital
500 Hogarth Ave
Geraldton Ontario P0T 1M0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Manitouwadge General Hospital
1 Health Care Cres
Manitouwadge Ontario P0T 2C0
Phone: 807-826-3251
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaan Pawa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Mar 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2009 - 330 Ridout St N
London Ontario N6A 0H7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: 1-855-959-2474
Address: 340 High St
Brightshores Health System - Southampton Hospital Ontario N0H 2L0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Geraldton District Hospital
500 Hogarth Ave
Geraldton Ontario P0T 1M0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: St. Joseph's Health Care
268 Grosvenor St
London Ontario N6A 4V2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Manitouwadge General Hospital
1 Health Care Cres
Manitouwadge Ontario P0T 2C0
Phone: 807-826-3251
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Brightshores Health System Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital Southampton
HOSPITAL: Brightshores Health System
LOCATION: Owen Sound

HOSPITAL: Grey Bruce Health Services Southampton Hospital
LOCATION: Southampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shaan Pawa Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 20 Mar 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAAN SINGH PAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAWA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHAAN SINGH PAWA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAWA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Manchester Medical School, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013