THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
09/05/25 05:49:40 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 109 Delancey St
Mount Sinai Beth Israel
Opioid treatment program
New York NY 10002-3201
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2126142840
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Beth Israel
Opioid Treatment Program
429 2nd Avenue
New York New York United States 10010
Phone: 212-726-6816
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17 E 102nd St
Internal Medicine Associates, REACH program
Internal Medicine
7th floor
New York NY United States 10029-5204
Phone: +1646-951-1693
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 109 Delancey St
Mount Sinai Beth Israel
Opioid treatment program
New York NY 10002-3201
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2126142840
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Mount Sinai Beth Israel
Opioid Treatment Program
429 2nd Avenue
New York New York United States 10010
Phone: 212-726-6816
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17 E 102nd St
Internal Medicine Associates, REACH program
Internal Medicine
7th floor
New York NY United States 10029-5204
Phone: +1646-951-1693
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 09 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YONINA CARA MAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. YONINA CARA MAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Imperial College School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Oct 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Oct 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013