THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:22:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Miami, 2005
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Suite 2
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Date Received: 16 May 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Vermont

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.J. Roseberry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Aug 2016

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: No Information Available
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Miami, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: Suite 2
125 Bell Farm Road
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Date Received: 16 May 2016

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Vermont

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.J. Roseberry Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 12 Aug 2016

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Miami, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 01 Jun 2016
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Feb 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jan 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 01 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2013