THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 03:51:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Natal, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, HINDI, ZULU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Varsha Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jan 2024

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, AFRIKAANS, HINDI, ZULU
Medical School: University of Natal, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
South Africa

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Varsha Singh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 26 Jan 2024

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VARSHA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. VARSHA SINGH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SINGH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Natal, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jul 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 27 Apr 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 27 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Member
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Sep 2013