THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 04:37:47 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 57800
Fax: 905-358-3030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Robert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Robert (CPSO#: 102086 )
Business Address: Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647 Extn: 57800

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E6X2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 378-4647
Extension: 57800
Fax: 905-358-3030

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Jennifer Robert Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Robert (CPSO#: 102086 )
Business Address: Greater Niagara General Hospital
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls Ontario L2E 6X2
(905) 378-4647 Extn: 57800

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANNE ROBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JENNIFER ANNE ROBERT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ROBERT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Jagiellonian University Medical College, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 16 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2013