THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
13/05/25 05:16:11 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne St W
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 3252201
Fax: (705) 3279169
Address: 1112 St. Andrews Dr
PO Box 760
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheryl Kemsley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 170 Colborne St W
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 3252201
Fax: (705) 3279169
Address: 1112 St. Andrews Dr
PO Box 760
Midland Ontario L4R 4P4
Phone: (705) 526-1300
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
West Parry Sound Health Centre Parry Sound
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: West Parry Sound Health Centre
LOCATION: Parry Sound

HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Cheryl Kemsley Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 17 Mar 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHERYL SANDRA KEMSLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEMSLEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CHERYL SANDRA KEMSLEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KEMSLEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dublin Trinity College, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Sep 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2013