THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:53:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Palliative Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 50801
Fax: 905-494-6758

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Roderick Davey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Davey (CPSO#: 102104 )
Business Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Palliative Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 50801

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Palliative Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Extension: 50801
Fax: 905-494-6758

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 28 Sep 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 28 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness Brampton
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton
HOSPITAL: William Osler - Peel Memorial Centre for Integrated Health and Wellness
LOCATION: Brampton

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: William Osler Health Centre - Brampton Civic Hospital
LOCATION: Brampton

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Roderick Davey Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 21 Feb 2017
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Davey (CPSO#: 102104 )
Business Address: William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
Division of Palliative Medicine
2100 Bovaird Drive East
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
(905) 494-2120 Extn: 50801

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN RODERICK DAVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JOHN RODERICK DAVEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DAVEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2013