THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 05:31:33 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1881 Steeles Ave W
Unit #2
North York ON M3H 5Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-665-2900
Fax: 416-665-2021
Address: G1-145 Front St E
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Unit A4
Polyclinic Family and Speciality Medicine
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
Phone: 416-222-6160
Fax: 416-222-9604

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Mar 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1881 Steeles Ave W
Unit #2
North York ON M3H 5Y4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-665-2900
Fax: 416-665-2021
Address: G1-145 Front St E
Inner City Health Associates
Toronto ON M5A 1E3
Phone: 416-591-4411
Fax: 416-640-2072
Address: 2 Champagne Drive
Unit A4
Polyclinic Family and Speciality Medicine
Toronto Ontario M3J 2C5
Phone: 416-222-6160
Fax: 416-222-9604

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Mar 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 14 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Mackenzie Health Richmond Hill
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Mackenzie Health
LOCATION: Richmond Hill

HOSPITAL: St Michael's Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUTH GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RUTH GROSSMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. GROSSMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jul 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2013