THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
19/05/25 04:59:45 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2101 32 St
Vernon BC V1T 5L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136123427
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CAMERON O'CONNOR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Feb 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2101 32 St
Vernon BC V1T 5L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6136123427
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 15 Dec 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 15 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CAMERON O'CONNOR MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 02 Feb 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON DESMOND O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CAMERON DESMOND O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 14 Dec 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 14 Dec 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013