THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 05:00:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Saud University, Riyadh College of Medicine, 2010
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
University of Toronto
PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
07 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2019 to 06 Aug 2019
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
29 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2018 to 28 Jul 2018
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
29 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2017 to 28 Jul 2017
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
20 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
07 Dec 2014 to 30 Mar 2015
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
01 Jul 2014 to 06 Dec 2014
McMaster University
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
07 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
McMaster University
PEAP - R - Neurosurgery
01 Oct 2013 to 06 Dec 2013
McMaster University
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2021 to 30 Jun 2022
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology
DATE: 01 Jul 2020 to 30 Jun 2021
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 6 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 07 Aug 2019 to 30 Jun 2020
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2019 to 06 Aug 2019
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 29 Jul 2018 to 30 Jun 2019
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2018 to 28 Jul 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 29 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 28 Jul 2017
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 29 Jul 2016 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 28 Jul 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 20 Nov 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 07 Dec 2014 to 30 Mar 2015
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 06 Dec 2014
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurosurgery
DATE: 07 Dec 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

SPECIALTY: PEAP - R - Neurosurgery
DATE: 01 Oct 2013 to 06 Dec 2013
UNIVERSITY: McMaster University

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 20 Nov 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Mar 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Dec 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Nov 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Mar 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Dec 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2013