THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:50:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite # 204
323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 4A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 304-8367
Fax: 905-304-0222

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Feb 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Preshanthini Shanmugathasan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Shanmugathasan (CPSO#: 102193 )
Business Address: 204-323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 4A8
(905) 304-8367

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Suite # 204
323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 4A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 304-8367
Fax: 905-304-0222

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Feb 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 04 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Preshanthini Shanmugathasan Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2014
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Shanmugathasan (CPSO#: 102193 )
Business Address: 204-323 Wilson Street East
Ancaster Ontario L9G 4A8
(905) 304-8367

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
21 May 2015
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 21 2015
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Preshanthini Shanmugathasan may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Preshanthini Shanmugathasan may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ross University School of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 21 May 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 29 Jan 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 21 May 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 21 May 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 29 Jan 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Oct 2013