THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 05:09:38 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SLOVAK

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Surgery - Surgical Assist
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-551-1909
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Surgery - Surgical Assist
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: 519-551-1909
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, SLOVAK
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1030 Ouellette Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Surgery - Surgical Assist
Windsor ON N9A 1E1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-551-1909
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1995 Lens Ave
Windsor Regional Hospital
Surgery - Surgical Assist
Windsor ON N8W 1L9
Phone: 519-551-1909
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus Windsor
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital Ouellette Campus
LOCATION: Windsor

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENISA DURCANSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURCANSKA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DENISA DURCANSKA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DURCANSKA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 14 Jul 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Apr 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Oct 2015
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 15 Jan 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Jul 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2016
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2015

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2013