THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
17/05/25 07:11:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1998
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Saint John Regional Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
400 University Avenue
Saint John New Brunswick E2L 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (506) 648-7114
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, MARATHI
Medical School: Nagpur University, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Saint John Regional Hospital
Department of Laboratory Medicine
400 University Avenue
Saint John New Brunswick E2L 4L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (506) 648-7114
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anatomical Pathology
Effective: 30 Jun 2014
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anatomical Pathology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
India

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGHANA TOAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MEGHANA TOAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TOAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nagpur University, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jan 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Nov 2013
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2013

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Oct 2013