THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:54:02 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 2002
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trainyards Medical centre
Unit B22
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1G 0Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 731-4770
Fax: (613) 731-4979
Address: 1370 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 0A1
Phone: 613-731-8448
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2370 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2B
Phone: 613-820-7333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Asghar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Jan 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Trainyards Medical centre
Unit B22
550 Terminal Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K1G 0Z3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 731-4770
Fax: (613) 731-4979
Address: 1370 Bank Street
Ottawa Ontario K1H 0A1
Phone: 613-731-8448
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2370 Carling Avenue
Ottawa Ontario K2B
Phone: 613-820-7333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 20 Dec 2013
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 20 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: A. Asghar Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 10 Jan 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYESHA ASGHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASGHAR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AYESHA ASGHAR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASGHAR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Nishtar Medical College, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2013