THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:07:16 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3501 Johnson Street
Hollywood Florida 33021
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9549872000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chater Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Feb 2018

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3501 Johnson Street
Hollywood Florida 33021
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9549872000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Otolaryngology - Head and Neck Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Florida

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Chater Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 28 Feb 2018

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GEORGE CHATER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHAEL GEORGE CHATER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHATER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Oct 2013
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Oct 2013