THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 04:08:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Northwestern University, 2010
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Dennis Weston Health Centre
2050 Weston Road
Toronto Ontario M9N 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 763-1171
Fax: 416-763-0573

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Apr 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Northwestern University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Mount Dennis Weston Health Centre
2050 Weston Road
Toronto Ontario M9N 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 763-1171
Fax: 416-763-0573

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 23 Apr 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 23 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Illinois

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL AVRAM FRYDRYCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRYDRYCH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAUL AVRAM FRYDRYCH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FRYDRYCH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Northwestern University, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Feb 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Feb 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2013