THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:19:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Washington, 2006
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Washington, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - California

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 23 Aug 2019
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
_ _

On July 26, 2019, the Medical Board of California, with the agreement of Dr. Salmon, made a decision and order effective August 23, 2019 staying an order of revocation of Dr. Salmon’s medical licence and authority to supervise physician assistants and advanced practice nurses, and placing her on probation for four years. The terms of the probation ordered by the Medical Board of California include requirements, among others, to abstain from use of alcohol and certain drugs and controlled substances, successfully complete an approved professionalism (ethics) program, have an approved worksite monitor and disclose to patients that Dr. Salmon is on probation. In addition, Dr. Salmon is prohibited from practising medicine in a solo practice and during overnight shifts. This order was made as a result of allegations that Dr. Salmon’s ability to practice medicine safely is impaired due to a health condition and controlled substance use, all of which are causes for discipline under the California Business and Professions Code. The College was notified of this finding by a report dated August 7, 2019. 

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Other Notifications (1)

Source: FSMB (USA)
Notice Type: External Findings - Other Regulatory Body
Effective Date: 23 Aug 2019
Summary:
Where a disciplinary finding is made against a member on or after September 1, 2015 by a medical regulatory or licensing authority in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, the College By-laws require certain information about the finding to be posted on the register, if the finding is known to the College.
The following are non-Ontario disciplinary findings made against this member, as known to the College, together with the corresponding information:
_ _

On July 26, 2019, the Medical Board of California, with the agreement of Dr. Salmon, made a decision and order effective August 23, 2019 staying an order of revocation of Dr. Salmon’s medical licence and authority to supervise physician assistants and advanced practice nurses, and placing her on probation for four years. The terms of the probation ordered by the Medical Board of California include requirements, among others, to abstain from use of alcohol and certain drugs and controlled substances, successfully complete an approved professionalism (ethics) program, have an approved worksite monitor and disclose to patients that Dr. Salmon is on probation. In addition, Dr. Salmon is prohibited from practising medicine in a solo practice and during overnight shifts. This order was made as a result of allegations that Dr. Salmon’s ability to practice medicine safely is impaired due to a health condition and controlled substance use, all of which are causes for discipline under the California Business and Professions Code. The College was notified of this finding by a report dated August 7, 2019. 

Training

Medical School: University of Washington, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 15 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Aug 2017
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 10 Aug 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 May 2015
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 08 May 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2013
DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 May 2015

DETAILS: Expiry date removed from certificate of registration.
Date: Effective: 08 May 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2013
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2013