THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Katholieke Universiteit Leuven, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
22 Mar 2014 to 30 Apr 2014
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
01 Jan 2014 to 21 Mar 2014
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 22 Mar 2014 to 30 Apr 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Orthopedic Surgery
DATE: 01 Jan 2014 to 21 Mar 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2014
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2014

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Jan 2014