THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:09:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queens Park Health
899 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 927-8462
Fax: (416) 551-8462

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI
Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Queens Park Health
899 Bay Street
Toronto Ontario M5S 3K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 927-8462
Fax: (416) 551-8462

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Nov 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIDHI PANDEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDEY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NIDHI PANDEY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANDEY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leeds School of Medicine, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2014