THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:16:21 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dammam, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dammam, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dammam, 2007
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2015 to 16 Feb 2016
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
12 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
17 Feb 2014 to 11 May 2014
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 16 Feb 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Psychiatry
DATE: 12 May 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Psychiatry
DATE: 17 Feb 2014 to 11 May 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Feb 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 May 2014
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 11 May 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Feb 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 May 2014

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 11 May 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2014