THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:44:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-460 West Hunt Club Rd
Nepean ON K2E 0B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-221-5957
Fax: 613-714-6803
Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus- The Arthritis Centre
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: 6137388400
Extension: 82883
Fax: 6137388228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 202-460 West Hunt Club Rd
Nepean ON K2E 0B8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-221-5957
Fax: 613-714-6803
Address: 1967 Riverside Dr
The Ottawa Hospital
Riverside Campus- The Arthritis Centre
1967 Riverside Dr
Ottawa ON K1H 7W9
Phone: 6137388400
Extension: 82883
Fax: 6137388228

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Rheumatology
Effective: 24 Oct 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Rheumatology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 24 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Riverside Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYSOON MOHAMED ELDOMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELDOMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MAYSOON MOHAMED ELDOMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELDOMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Calgary, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Apr 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Mar 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Feb 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Mar 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Feb 2014