THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:30:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1974
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1974

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 06 Jun 1984
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 1984
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Saskatchewan College of Medicine, 1974

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Resigned from membership. Effective: 14 Apr 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Jan 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 15 Aug 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Mar 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Resigned from membership.
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Oct 2014

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 15 Aug 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Mar 2014