THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:17:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Rīga Stradiņš University Faculty of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 202-106 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 4E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 742-0680
Fax: (416) 742-0681
Address: 764 Baker Crescent
Kingston Ontario K7M 6P6
Phone: 613.389.4400
Fax: 613.389.4450
Address: 4576 Yonge St
Airway ENT and Oral Surgery Clinic
Suite 100
North York ON M2N 6N4
Phone: (647) 956-0336
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 205-330 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
Phone: (905) 764-8808
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 410-2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1R 3A6
Phone: 416.751.4356
Fax: 416-751-9104

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Rīga Stradiņš University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suite 202-106 Humber College Boulevard
Toronto Ontario M9V 4E4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 742-0680
Fax: (416) 742-0681
Address: 764 Baker Crescent
Kingston Ontario K7M 6P6
Phone: 613.389.4400
Fax: 613.389.4450
Address: 4576 Yonge St
Airway ENT and Oral Surgery Clinic
Suite 100
North York ON M2N 6N4
Phone: (647) 956-0336
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 205-330 Highway 7 E
Richmond Hill ON L4B 3P8
Phone: (905) 764-8808
Fax: No Information Available
Address: suite 410-2130 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto Ontario M1R 3A6
Phone: 416.751.4356
Fax: 416-751-9104

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARINA BINGELIENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINGELIENE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ARINA BINGELIENE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BINGELIENE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Rīga Stradiņš University Faculty of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Mar 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 10 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2014