THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/05/25 03:32:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Babylon, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Babylon, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Babylon, 2004
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine
01 Jul 2017 to 10 Jul 2017
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
01 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Oct 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2015 to 31 Mar 2016
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Toronto
Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
17 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
PEAP - CF - Nephrology
31 Mar 2014 to 16 Jun 2014
University of Toronto
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2017 to 10 Jul 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - General Internal Medicine
DATE: 01 Apr 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Oct 2016 to 31 Mar 2017
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2016 to 30 Sep 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Apr 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Mar 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Nephrology
DATE: 17 Jun 2014 to 30 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Nephrology
DATE: 31 Mar 2014 to 16 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Toronto

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Jul 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Jul 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2014