THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:14:37 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 726 Bloor St W
Suite B102
Toronto ON M6G 4A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-964-0800
Fax: 416-964-2935

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 726 Bloor St W
Suite B102
Toronto ON M6G 4A1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-964-0800
Fax: 416-964-2935

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 14 Sep 2015
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 14 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sinai Health System Toronto
HOSPITAL: Sinai Health System
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Mar 2017
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 08 2017
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Elysha Mawji may practise medicine independently in family medicine.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Elysha Mawji may practise medicine independently in family medicine.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 08 Mar 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 Sep 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 06 Feb 2015
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2015
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 May 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Apr 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 08 Mar 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2015
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 06 Feb 2015

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2015

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 May 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Apr 2014