THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 04:03:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Karnatak University Dharwar, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jun 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 15 May 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 May 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 31 Mar 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 May 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 May 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 31 Mar 2014