THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
28/05/25 02:50:41 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

No Specialty Reported

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.
This physician is inactive (Expired, Resigned, Suspended, Revoked, or Deceased) and is not permitted to practise medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Sultan Qaboos University College of Medicine, 2005
Ontario Postgraduate Training:
SPECIALTY DATE UNIVERSITY
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine
01 Jul 2015 to 30 Apr 2016
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine
01 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
University of Ottawa
Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine
26 Jun 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
University of Ottawa
PEAP - CF - Emergency Medicine
01 May 2014 to 25 Jun 2014
University of Ottawa
SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Apr 2016
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 May 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: Clinical Fellow - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 26 Jun 2014 to 30 Apr 2015
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

SPECIALTY: PEAP - CF - Emergency Medicine
DATE: 01 May 2014 to 25 Jun 2014
UNIVERSITY: University of Ottawa

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Apr 2016
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 May 2014
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Apr 2016

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Jun 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 May 2014