THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:39:07 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: #200
4207-98 Street
Insight Medical Imaging
Edmonton Alberta T6E 5R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 780-489-7851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Tamjeedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jul 2020

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, FARSI
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: #200
4207-98 Street
Insight Medical Imaging
Edmonton Alberta T6E 5R7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 780-489-7851
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Diagnostic Radiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Diagnostic Radiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B. Tamjeedi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 24 Jul 2020

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAHAR TAMJEEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMJEEDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BAHAR TAMJEEDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAMJEEDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 May 2014
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 May 2014