THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Abdullah Sulaiman Street
King Abdulaziz University Hospital
Jaddat 22243
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Abdullah Sulaiman Street
King Abdulaziz University Hospital
Jaddat 22243
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Ophthalmology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Ophthalmology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REEM KHALID A ALNABULSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNABULSI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. REEM KHALID A ALNABULSI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALNABULSI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: King Abdulaziz University College of Medicine, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Sep 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 19 May 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Sep 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 2014