THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:14:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1997
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Johnson Ave
Miramichi NB E1N 3B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2928 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1M1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BENGALI, HINDI
Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 4 Johnson Ave
Miramichi NB E1N 3B7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 2928 Danforth Ave
Toronto ON M4C 1M1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Dec 2022
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 06 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZINIA HAMID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ZINIA HAMID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Chittagong, 1997

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Mar 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 31 Aug 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Apr 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 19 Apr 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Apr 2017
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 14 May 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2018

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2017

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 14 May 2014