THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:24:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1990
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Carlington Community Health Centre
900 Merivale Road
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 5Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-722-2161
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Carlington Community Health Centre
900 Merivale Road
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 5Z8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-722-2161
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Jul 2014
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 29 2014
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
20 May 2016
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: May 20 2016
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Catriona Jane Birnie may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.


VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Catriona Jane Birnie may practise medicine independently in family
medicine.


Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Glasgow School of Medicine, Dentistry and Nursing, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 May 2016
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 04 Sep 2015
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 11 Dec 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 26 May 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 May 2016

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2015

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 11 Dec 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 May 2014
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 May 2014