THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 03:47:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 May 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shannon Winterburn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Nov 2022

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 31 May 2023
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 31 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Haldimand War Memorial Hospital Dunnville
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
Niagara Health System - Welland Site Welland
Niagara Health System Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site Fort Erie
Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site Port Colborne
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Weeneebayko Area Health Authority Moose Factory
HOSPITAL: Haldimand War Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Dunnville

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Welland Site
LOCATION: Welland

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System
LOCATION: Niagara Falls

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Fort Erie Site
LOCATION: Fort Erie

HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System - Port Colborne Site
LOCATION: Port Colborne

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Weeneebayko Area Health Authority
LOCATION: Moose Factory

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Shannon Winterburn Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 01 Nov 2022

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON RENNIE WINTERBURN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINTERBURN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHANNON RENNIE WINTERBURN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. WINTERBURN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014