THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:26:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave
Obstetrics and Gynecology
4th floor, D4
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137614401
Fax: 6137615141

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 11 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Ottawa Hospital Civic Campus
1053 Carling Ave
Obstetrics and Gynecology
4th floor, D4
Ottawa ON K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6137614401
Fax: 6137615141

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Maternal Fetal Medicine
Effective: 11 Nov 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Maternal Fetal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 11 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOOR AMILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMILY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NOOR AMILY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AMILY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014