THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:26:30 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3079 Danforth Avenue
Access Alliance
Toronto Ontario M1L 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-699-7823
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Emergency Department
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G1X8
Phone: 416-813-6621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
N9A 1E1
Windsor Ontario L4B 2J1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Ave
N9A 1E1
Windsor Ontario L4B 2J1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin Losier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Apr 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3079 Danforth Avenue
Access Alliance
Toronto Ontario M1L 1A8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-699-7823
Fax: No Information Available
Address: The Hospital for Sick Children
Emergency Department
555 University Avenue
Toronto Ontario M5G1X8
Phone: 416-813-6621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 1030 Ouellette Ave
N9A 1E1
Windsor Ontario L4B 2J1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Windsor Regional Hospital
1030 Ouellette Ave
N9A 1E1
Windsor Ontario L4B 2J1
Phone: (519) 973-4411
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
Effective: 10 Oct 2017
College of Family Physicians of Canada
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Dec 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 10 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 16 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hospital For Sick Children Toronto
Oak Valley Health Markham
Windsor Regional Hospital Windsor
HOSPITAL: Hospital For Sick Children
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

HOSPITAL: Windsor Regional Hospital
LOCATION: Windsor

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Justin Losier Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 23 Apr 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN H LOSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOSIER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JUSTIN H LOSIER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LOSIER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014