THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:06:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-8730 The Gore Rd
Brampton ON L6P 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 557-2232
Fax: (905) 450-2535
Address: 8730 The Gore Road
Brampton Ontario L6P 0B1
Phone: (647) 557-2232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10-17 Ray Lawson Blvd
Brampton ON L6Y 5L8
Phone: 9054977475
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-8730 The Gore Rd
Brampton ON L6P 0B1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (647) 557-2232
Fax: (905) 450-2535
Address: 8730 The Gore Road
Brampton Ontario L6P 0B1
Phone: (647) 557-2232
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10-17 Ray Lawson Blvd
Brampton ON L6Y 5L8
Phone: 9054977475
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 17 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 17 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UMAIR MOHAMMAD IQBAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IQBAL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UMAIR MOHAMMAD IQBAL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. IQBAL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014