THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 02:59:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-748-4975
Fax: 613-748-4975
Address: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Respirology Clinic
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Phone: 613-632-1111, extension 51201
Fax: Fax: 613-636-6175

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 15 May 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Montfort Hospital
713 Montreal Rd
Ottawa Ontario K1K 0T2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-748-4975
Fax: 613-748-4975
Address: 1111 Ghislain St
Hawkesbury General Hospital
Respirology Clinic
Hawkesbury ON K6A 3G5
Phone: 613-632-1111, extension 51201
Fax: Fax: 613-636-6175

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 15 May 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 15 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Hawkesbury and District General Hospital Hawkesbury
Hopital Montfort Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Hawkesbury and District General Hospital
LOCATION: Hawkesbury

HOSPITAL: Hopital Montfort
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE BEAUCHESNE CHARRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARRON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CATHERINE BEAUCHESNE CHARRON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHARRON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Apr 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2017
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Apr 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2017

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014