THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 03:26:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Medicine Department
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-621-2330
Fax: 519-740-4938
Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Phone: 1- (888) 930-6571
Fax: Fax: (855) 967-2945

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
Emergency Medicine Department
Cambridge Ontario N1R 3G2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-621-2330
Fax: 519-740-4938
Address: 700 Coronation Blvd
Cambridge ON N1R 3G2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: B-6 Harvey St
Chatham ON N7M 1L6
Phone: 1- (888) 930-6571
Fax: Fax: (855) 967-2945

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 06 Jun 2016
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 06 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge
HOSPITAL: Cambridge Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Cambridge

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULO CLASIO DE GOUVEIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE GOUVEIA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PAULO CLASIO DE GOUVEIA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE GOUVEIA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2016
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jun 2016

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014