THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 03:27:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Barcelona, 2004
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CATALAN, SPANISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-7654
Extension: 424845
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University Health Network
Division of Gastroenterology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Paediatric Ambulatory Clinic
3rd floor
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6479
Fax: 416-756-6152

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, CATALAN, SPANISH
Medical School: University of Barcelona, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Hospital for Sick Children
Division of Gastroenterology
555 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 1X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-813-7654
Extension: 424845
Fax: No Information Available
Address: University Health Network
Division of Gastroenterology
200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Paediatric Ambulatory Clinic
3rd floor
4001 Leslie Street
Toronto Ontario M2K 1E1
Phone: 416-756-6479
Fax: 416-756-6152

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 01 Jul 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: University Health Network Toronto General Hospital Site
LOCATION: Toronto

HOSPITAL: North York General Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Jul 2019
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jul 01 2019
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Maria del Mar Miserachs Barba may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Division of Gastroenterology, Nutrition and Hepatology,
University of Toronto, in which Dr. Miserachs Barba holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Miserachs Barba no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Miserachs Barba's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Miserachs Barba's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2019. In accordance with
paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2026.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Maria del Mar Miserachs Barba may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Pediatrics, Division of Gastroenterology, Nutrition and Hepatology,
University of Toronto, in which Dr. Miserachs Barba holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of her academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Miserachs Barba no longer holds the
academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Miserachs Barba's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Miserachs Barba's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2019. In accordance with
paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the
Registration Committee, automatically expire on June 30, 2026.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Barcelona, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2017
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2017
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014