THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:00:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3031
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TJ Leeper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: LHSC University Hospital
Department of Anesthesiology
339 Windermere Rd
London Ontario N6A 5A5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (519) 663-3031
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Anesthesiology
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Anesthesiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: TJ Leeper Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive End Date: 19 Sep 2021

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRENCE JOHN LEEPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEEPER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. TERRENCE JOHN LEEPER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. LEEPER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Aug 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Aug 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014