THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
18/05/25 05:02:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Ave
University Health Network
Norman Urquhart Building
7N-718A
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4609
Fax: 416-340-3750
Address: 2180 Meadowvale Blvd
The Reproductive Care Centre
Mississauga ON L5N 5S3
Phone: 905-816-9822
Fax: 905-816-9833
Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Endocrinology
12EN
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3772
Fax: 416 340 5223

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 585 University Ave
University Health Network
Norman Urquhart Building
7N-718A
Toronto ON M5G 2N2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-340-4609
Fax: 416-340-3750
Address: 2180 Meadowvale Blvd
The Reproductive Care Centre
Mississauga ON L5N 5S3
Phone: 905-816-9822
Fax: 905-816-9833
Address: 200 Elizabeth Street
Toronto General Hospital
Endocrinology
12EN
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C4
Phone: 416-340-3772
Fax: 416 340 5223

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Endocrinology and Metabolism
Effective: 08 Oct 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Endocrinology and Metabolism
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 08 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRINE ELIZABETH USMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. USMANI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHIRINE ELIZABETH USMANI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. USMANI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014