THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 05:34:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 63-470 Dundas St E
Providence Care Hospital
Seniors Mental Health
Unit 63
Belleville ON K8N 1G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-771-0133
Fax: 613-771-0916

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 63-470 Dundas St E
Providence Care Hospital
Seniors Mental Health
Unit 63
Belleville ON K8N 1G1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-771-0133
Fax: 613-771-0916

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Psychiatry
Effective: 20 Sep 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 20 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Centre Kingston
HOSPITAL: Kingston Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

HOSPITAL: Providence Care Centre
LOCATION: Kingston

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY ELIZABETH ST DENIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST DENIS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMILY ELIZABETH ST DENIS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ST DENIS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University of the Americas (Belize), 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014