THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
14/05/25 03:14:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gabrielle Salmers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Salmers (CPSO#: 103247 )
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
7053303202

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Address not Available
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 13 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 13 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Georgian Bay General Hospital Midland
Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital Orillia
HOSPITAL: Georgian Bay General Hospital
LOCATION: Midland

HOSPITAL: Orillia Soldiers Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Orillia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gabrielle Salmers Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Salmers (CPSO#: 103247 )
Business Address: 170 Colborne Street West
Orillia Ontario L3V 2Z3
7053303202

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIELLE KATHLEEN SALMERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALMERS is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GABRIELLE KATHLEEN SALMERS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SALMERS is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sydney, Sydney Medical School, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2014
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Sep 2014

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014