THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
12/05/25 03:50:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Townline Road South
Grandview Kids
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-728-1673
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-140 Rolling Hills Dr
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Orangeville ON L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 03 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 600 Townline Road South
Grandview Kids
Oshawa Ontario L1H 7K6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-728-1673
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 100-140 Rolling Hills Dr
Headwaters Health Care Centre
Orangeville ON L9W 4X8
Phone: (519) 941-2410
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Scarborough General Hospital
Toronto Ontario M1P 2V5
Phone: 416-438-2911
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Developmental Pediatrics
Effective: 03 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Pediatrics
Effective: 12 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Developmental Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 03 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 12 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste. Marie
HOSPITAL: Sault Area Hospital
LOCATION: Sault Ste. Marie

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGO NICOLE MORASSUT STEVENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENSON is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARGO NICOLE MORASSUT STEVENSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. STEVENSON is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Nov 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Jul 2018
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2018
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Sep 2017
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2017
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jun 2016
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Jun 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Apr 2015
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2018

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2017

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Aug 2017

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2016

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Apr 2015

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014