THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
03/05/25 03:39:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 302-1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London Spine Centre
London ON N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 231 7171
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
LHSC University Hospital
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 23 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 302-1055 Fanshawe Park Rd W
London Spine Centre
London ON N6G 0W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 231 7171
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 339-291 Windermere Rd
LHSC University Hospital
London ON N6G 2J9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurosurgery
Effective: 23 May 2024
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurosurgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 23 2024
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN JENNIFER ZARNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARNETT is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. LAUREN JENNIFER ZARNETT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZARNETT is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Jun 2024
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Oct 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Oct 2023
Expired: Failure to Renew Membership Effective: 09 Aug 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Sep 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2014
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 04 Sep 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2023
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Oct 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Failure to Renew Membership
Date: Effective: 09 Aug 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2014